NY S03347 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reclassifies court officers and court clerks of the unified court system as police officers and repeals provisions relating to their status as peace officers.
Title
Reclassifies court officers and court clerks of the unified court system as police officers and repeals provisions relating to their status as peace officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.484 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2015-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05338 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to codes