NY S03344 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.268
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.268
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school district compliance with physical education instruction requirements in elementary grades in public schools to be reported to the department of education.
Title
Requires school district compliance with physical education instruction requirements in elementary grades in public schools to be reported to the department of education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.268 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.121 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a3880b |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1722 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3344B |
2016-05-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2016-01-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3344A |
2016-01-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2015-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03880 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s3344b