NY A03880 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s3344b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s3344b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school district compliance with physical education instruction requirements in elementary grades in public schools to be reported to the department of education.
Title
Requires school district compliance with physical education instruction requirements in elementary grades in public schools to be reported to the department of education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s3344b |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.121 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.121 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | print number 3880b |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | print number 3880a |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-28 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03344 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.268