NY S03292 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the safe water and infrastructure action program for the purpose of making payments toward the replacement and rehabilitation of existing local municipally-owned and funded drinking water, storm water and sanitary sewer systems; applies to any county, city, town or village drinking water system, storm water system or sanitary sewer system within the state that is not under the maintenance and/or operational jurisdiction of the state nor any private entity.
Title
Establishes the safe water and infrastructure action program for the purpose of making payments toward the replacement and rehabilitation of existing local municipally-owned and funded drinking water, storm water and sanitary sewer systems; applies to any county, city, town or village drinking water system, storm water system or sanitary sewer system within the state that is not under the maintenance and/or operational jurisdiction of the state nor any private entity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2018-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1710 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3292A |
2018-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03907 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - print number 3907a