NY S03250 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-15 - PRINT NUMBER 3250B
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-15 - PRINT NUMBER 3250B
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires policies providing prescription drug coverage to cover vitamins and supplements, medical foods, and other medications to mitigate and/or treat the symptoms of mitochondrial disease.
Title
Requires policies providing prescription drug coverage to cover vitamins and supplements, medical foods, and other medications to mitigate and/or treat the symptoms of mitochondrial disease.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] |
Sen. George Latimer [D] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3250B |
2016-01-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2015-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3250A |
2015-04-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2015-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05174 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - print number 5174b