NY A05174 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - print number 5174b
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - print number 5174b
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires policies providing prescription drug coverage to cover vitamins and supplements, medical foods, and other medications to mitigate and/or treat the symptoms of mitochondrial disease.
Title
Requires policies providing prescription drug coverage to cover vitamins and supplements, medical foods, and other medications to mitigate and/or treat the symptoms of mitochondrial disease.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | print number 5174b |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | print number 5174a |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to insurance |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03250 (Same As) 2016-01-15 - PRINT NUMBER 3250B