NY S03230 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3230A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3230A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Janice Middlebrooks, the widow of William James Middlebrooks, to file a retirement option election on behalf of her deceased husband.
Title
Authorizes Janice Middlebrooks, the widow of William James Middlebrooks, to file a retirement option election on behalf of her deceased husband.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3230A |
2012-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2011-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07709 (Same As) 2012-01-20 - print number 7709a