NY A07709 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-20 - print number 7709a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-20 - print number 7709a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Janice Middlebrooks, the widow of William James Middlebrooks, to file a retirement option election on behalf of her deceased husband.
Title
Authorizes Janice Middlebrooks, the widow of William James Middlebrooks, to file a retirement option election on behalf of her deceased husband.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-20 | Assembly | print number 7709a |
2012-01-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03230 (Same As) 2012-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3230A