NY S03213 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - SIGNED CHAP.449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to water quality testing for land clearing debris and compost facilities in Nassau and Suffolk counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to water quality testing for land clearing debris and compost facilities in Nassau and Suffolk counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29AssemblySIGNED CHAP.449
2017-11-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-05Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.76
2017-06-05Assemblysubstituted for a2623
2017-03-20Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2017-03-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-03-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-03-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-02-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-02-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.268
2017-01-20SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A02623 (Same As) 2017-06-05 - substituted by s3213

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback