NY A02623 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - substituted by s3213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - substituted by s3213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to water quality testing for land clearing debris and compost facilities in Nassau and Suffolk counties.
Title
Relates to water quality testing for land clearing debris and compost facilities in Nassau and Suffolk counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s3213 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.76 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.76 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03213 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - SIGNED CHAP.449