NY S03203 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4969B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4969B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the crime of forcible touching.
Title
Relates to the crime of forcible touching.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4969B |
2015-06-15 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3203A |
2015-06-15 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-15 | Senate | returned to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1391 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04969 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - signed chap.250