NY S03151 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - PRINT NUMBER 3151A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - PRINT NUMBER 3151A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the medical aid in dying act; relates to a terminally ill patient's request for and use of medication for medical aid in dying.
Title
Relates to the medical aid in dying act; relates to a terminally ill patient's request for and use of medication for medical aid in dying.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Marisol Alcantara [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] |
Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3151A |
2018-03-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02383 (Same As) 2018-02-20 - print number 2383a