NY S03134 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A948B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A948B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to persons designated as peace officers.
Title
Relates to persons designated as peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A948B |
2012-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1526 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3134B |
2011-06-22 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-22 | Senate | returned to senate |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2011-06-15 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3134A |
2011-06-15 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-15 | Senate | returned to senate |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.267 |
2011-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00948 (Same As) 2012-12-17 - signed chap.502