NY A00948 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - signed chap.502
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to persons designated as peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to persons designated as peace officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17Senatesigned chap.502
2012-12-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1526
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3134B
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.437
2012-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.437
2012-06-20Assemblyreported
2012-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to codes
2011-06-22Assemblyprint number 948b
2011-06-22Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2011-06-15Assemblyprint number 948a
2011-06-15Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2011-01-05Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S03134 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A948B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00948&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00948&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00948
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00948&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00948A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00948&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00948B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00948&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A948#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback