NY S03099 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes step children within the meaning of the term "child" for purposes of additional credits for children of firefighters, police officers, emergency medical technicians and paramedics killed in the line of duty.
Title
Includes step children within the meaning of the term "child" for purposes of additional credits for children of firefighters, police officers, emergency medical technicians and paramedics killed in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2020-01-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.228 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.159 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00840 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees