NY S03098 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the New York state advisory council on coronavirus economic recovery and workforce development which will work to promote economic development and collaboration opportunities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the New York state advisory council on coronavirus economic recovery and workforce development which will work to promote economic development and collaboration opportunities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-15Assemblyreferred to economic development
2022-02-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-02-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2022-01-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2022-01-19Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2022-01-19SenateAMENDED 3098D
2022-01-18Senate1ST REPORT CAL.216
2022-01-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 3098C
2022-01-13SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2022-01-05SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2021-06-10SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2021-03-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-03-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-03-01SenateAMENDED 3098B
2021-02-24Senate1ST REPORT CAL.430
2021-02-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 3098A
2021-02-11SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2021-01-27SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS

Same As/Similar To

A09184 (Same As) 2022-02-09 - referred to economic development

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S3098
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03098&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03098
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03098&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03098A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03098&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03098B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03098&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03098C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03098&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03098D
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S3098#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S3098#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S3098#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback