NY S03065 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring training to reduce abusive behavior, bullying, and cyberbullying in the workplace; requires the commissioner of labor, in consultation with the commissioner of human rights, to develop an abusive behavior, bullying, and cyberbullying in the workplace prevention training program for all employees.
Title
Relates to requiring training to reduce abusive behavior, bullying, and cyberbullying in the workplace; requires the commissioner of labor, in consultation with the commissioner of human rights, to develop an abusive behavior, bullying, and cyberbullying in the workplace prevention training program for all employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3065A |
2023-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A08934 (Same As) 2024-01-30 - referred to labor