NY S03060 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires operators of nursing homes and residential health care facilities to provide notification of certain contracts and agreements to all residents, representatives, staff and the office of the long-term care ombudsman.
Title
Requires operators of nursing homes and residential health care facilities to provide notification of certain contracts and agreements to all residents, representatives, staff and the office of the long-term care ombudsman.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.355 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |