NY S03014 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits littering on state park lands.
Title
Prohibits littering on state park lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1319 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2013-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03576 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development