NY S02932 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-27 - PRINT NUMBER 2932A
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-27 - PRINT NUMBER 2932A
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes physicians, optometrists and ophthalmic dispensers to join together to establish professional service corporations, limited liability companies and registered limited liability partnerships.
Title
Authorizes physicians, optometrists and ophthalmic dispensers to join together to establish professional service corporations, limited liability companies and registered limited liability partnerships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2932A |
2012-01-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2011-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00058 (Same As) 2012-02-02 - print number 58a