NY S02905 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an increased tax credit for the total number of eligible farm employees.
Title
Provides an increased tax credit for the total number of eligible farm employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1540 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2905A |
2018-05-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.446 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06717 (Same As) 2018-05-21 - print number 6717a