NY S02904 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 2904B
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 2904B
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the licensing of genetic counselors; creates the state committee for genetic counseling.
Title
Provides for the licensing of genetic counselors; creates the state committee for genetic counseling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2904B |
2014-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-02-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2904A |
2014-02-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2013-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03350 (Same As) 2014-06-13 - print number 3350b