NY S02899 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7822A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7822A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to agency reports; requires such reports to be posted on line; provides for a letter or notice to be sent to members of the legislature indicating the website address and the name of the person at such state agency to whom a legislator may request a printed copy of such report; relates to confidentiality of certain information in such reports.
Title
Relates to agency reports; requires such reports to be posted on line; provides for a letter or notice to be sent to members of the legislature indicating the website address and the name of the person at such state agency to whom a legislator may request a printed copy of such report; relates to confidentiality of certain information in such reports.
Sponsors
Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Owen Johnson [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. George Maziarz [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7822A |
2012-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2899A |
2012-05-30 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2012-04-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-04-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.332 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2011-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.663 |
2011-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07822 (Same As) 2012-08-01 - signed chap.278