NY S02897 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1049
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1049
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals certain requirements for sponsors of learning activities which contribute to mandatory continuing competency requirements for occupational therapists and occupational therapy assistants.
Title
Repeals certain requirements for sponsors of learning activities which contribute to mandatory continuing competency requirements for occupational therapists and occupational therapy assistants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1049 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.171 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01049 (Same As) 2013-04-09 - signed chap.18