NY S02813 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the installation of fire extinguishers in all multiple dwellings.
Title
Requires the installation of fire extinguishers in all multiple dwellings.
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] |
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2020-02-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.389 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2813A |
2020-01-22 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01666 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations