NY S02806 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - PRINT NUMBER 2806A
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - PRINT NUMBER 2806A
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the opt in program for reporting of suspected financial exploitation.
Title
Establishes the opt in program for reporting of suspected financial exploitation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2806A |
2016-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2015-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A04037 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES