NY S02798 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1231A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1231A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to contractual liability insurance policies; requires the insurer to either discharge the obligations of the provider under the terms of the service contract, or in the event of the provider's nonperformance, cancellation of the service contract.
Title
Relates to contractual liability insurance policies; requires the insurer to either discharge the obligations of the provider under the terms of the service contract, or in the event of the provider's nonperformance, cancellation of the service contract.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1231A |
2024-05-28 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2798B |
2024-05-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2798A |
2024-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.798 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2023-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1183 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01231 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY