NY A01231 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-22 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to contractual liability insurance policies; requires the insurer to either discharge the obligations of the provider under the terms of the service contract, or in the event of the provider's nonperformance, cancellation of the service contract.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to contractual liability insurance policies; requires the insurer to either discharge the obligations of the provider under the terms of the service contract, or in the event of the provider's nonperformance, cancellation of the service contract.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-11-22Assemblytabled
2024-11-22Assemblyvetoed memo.19
2024-11-15Assemblydelivered to governor
2024-06-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-03Senate3RD READING CAL.798
2024-06-03SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2798B
2024-05-30SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE
2024-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2024-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2024-05-30Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.228
2024-05-30Assemblyrules report cal.228
2024-05-30Assemblyreported
2024-05-22Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-15Assemblyprint number 1231a
2024-05-15Assemblyamend and recommit to insurance
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to insurance
2023-01-13Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S02798 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1231A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A1231
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01231&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01231
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01231&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01231A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01231&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01231&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01231&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A1231#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback