NY S02776 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the healthcare services provided by telehealth.
Title
Expands the healthcare services provided by telehealth.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Assembly | referred to health |
2024-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1167 |
2024-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2776A |
2024-05-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.521 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04940 (Same As) 2024-05-08 - print number 4940a