NY S02759 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the designation of the public holiday of Columbus day to Indigenous People's day.
Title
Changes the designation of the public holiday of Columbus day to Indigenous People's day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02492 (Same As) 2021-01-19 - referred to governmental operations
A10728 (Same As) 2022-09-23 - referred to governmental operations
A10728 (Same As) 2022-09-23 - referred to governmental operations