NY S02690 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires extending the eligibility for the basic STAR exemption and enhanced STAR exemption to real property owned by a non-spouse relative of a senior citizen who shares such primary residence with such senior citizen.
Title
Requires extending the eligibility for the basic STAR exemption and enhanced STAR exemption to real property owned by a non-spouse relative of a senior citizen who shares such primary residence with such senior citizen.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2015-05-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A05470 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to real property taxation