NY S02653 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that qualified voters who choose to vote by mail may do so.
Title
Provides that qualified voters who choose to vote by mail may do so.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-17 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-01 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |