NY S02627 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the crime of falsely accusing someone of a crime.
Title
Creates the crime of falsely accusing someone of a crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-03-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.623 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.164 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06541 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes