NY S02584 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - PRINT NUMBER 2584B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - PRINT NUMBER 2584B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the furnishing of registration information by the commissioner of the department of motor vehicles.
Title
Relates to the furnishing of registration information by the commissioner of the department of motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2584B |
2018-03-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2584A |
2017-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08414 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation