NY S02575 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - signed chap.101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - signed chap.101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a law enforcement officer or peace officer who discharges his or her weapon under circumstances where a person could be struck by a bullet to immediately report the incident to his or her superiors.
Title
Requires a law enforcement officer or peace officer who discharges his or her weapon under circumstances where a person could be struck by a bullet to immediately report the incident to his or her superiors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | Senate | signed chap.101 |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.677 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2575B |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-08 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-08 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.65 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | rules report cal.65 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-08 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-05 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10608 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.677 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2575B |
2020-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.563 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2575A |
2019-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2019-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00927 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.44
A10608 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - signed chap.101
A10608 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - signed chap.101