NY S02575 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - PRINT NUMBER 2575C
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - PRINT NUMBER 2575C
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the performance of a study regarding homeless persons who are veterans in the state of New York.
Title
Relates to the performance of a study regarding homeless persons who are veterans in the state of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2575C |
2016-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-02-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2575B |
2016-02-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-01-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2575A |
2016-01-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2015-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A00434 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - amended on third reading 434c