NY S02570 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides additional tax exemptions on qualifying residential real property where two or more qualified veterans live in the same household.
Title
Provides additional tax exemptions on qualifying residential real property where two or more qualified veterans live in the same household.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2020-02-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.126 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2019-05-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.340 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |