NY S02539 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 2539A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 2539A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates political contribution activities by intermediaries; requires that when contributions made by an intermediary to a candidate or a committee are over $1,000, the name, occupation and address of each contributor shall be disclosed.
Title
Regulates political contribution activities by intermediaries; requires that when contributions made by an intermediary to a candidate or a committee are over $1,000, the name, occupation and address of each contributor shall be disclosed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2539A |
2014-01-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2013-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00144 (Same As) 2014-02-05 - print number 144a