NY S02532 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires chain restaurants to place an icon on menus next to food items that have a high content of sodium.
Title
Requires chain restaurants to place an icon on menus next to food items that have a high content of sodium.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to health |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.985 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2532B |
2022-04-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2022-01-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2532A |
2022-01-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08860 (Same As) 2022-08-03 - print number 8860b