NY A08860 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-03 - print number 8860b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-03 - print number 8860b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires chain restaurants to place an icon on menus next to food items that have a high content of sodium.
Title
Requires chain restaurants to place an icon on menus next to food items that have a high content of sodium.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-03 | Assembly | print number 8860b |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | print number 8860a |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02532 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - referred to health