NY S02529 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes certain pharmacists as qualified health care professionals and authorizes such pharmacists to complete a waived test and directs the commissioner of health to establish a list of CLIA-waived tests.
Title
Includes certain pharmacists as qualified health care professionals and authorizes such pharmacists to complete a waived test and directs the commissioner of health to establish a list of CLIA-waived tests.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Mike Martucci [R] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.659 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A03033 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to higher education