NY S02523 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutes chapter 28 of the consolidated laws as the interstate authorities law; continues all operations of the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey; repeals chapters relating to the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey.
Title
Constitutes chapter 28 of the consolidated laws as the interstate authorities law; continues all operations of the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey; repeals chapters relating to the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.582 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2523A |
2018-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.138 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03768 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - enacting clause stricken
A10106 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - print number 10106a
A10106 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - print number 10106a