NY S02507 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for preferences under the affordable home ownership development program for service related disabled veterans.
Title
Provides for preferences under the affordable home ownership development program for service related disabled veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1141 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2011-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A01351 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - held for consideration in housing