NY S02451 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - SIGNED CHAP.19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - SIGNED CHAP.19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes extreme risk protection orders as a court-issued order of protection prohibiting a person from purchasing, possessing or attempting to purchase or possess a firearm, rifle or shotgun.
Title
Establishes extreme risk protection orders as a court-issued order of protection prohibiting a person from purchasing, possessing or attempting to purchase or possess a firearm, rifle or shotgun.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.19 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.24 |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | substituted for a2689 |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-01-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-28 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.95 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02689 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - SIGNED CHAP.19