NY A02689 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - substituted by s2451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes extreme risk protection orders as a court-issued order of protection prohibiting a person from purchasing, possessing or attempting to purchase or possess a firearm, rifle or shotgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes extreme risk protection orders as a court-issued order of protection prohibiting a person from purchasing, possessing or attempting to purchase or possess a firearm, rifle or shotgun.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29Assemblysubstituted by s2451
2019-01-28Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.24
2019-01-28Assemblyrules report cal.24
2019-01-28Assemblyreported
2019-01-28Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-24Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S02451 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - SIGNED CHAP.19

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback