NY S02415 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes attachments to electronic devices within the meaning of the term "imitation weapon".
Title
Includes attachments to electronic devices within the meaning of the term "imitation weapon".
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.192 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00153 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to consumer affairs and protection