NY S02397 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the New York state department of financial services and the New York state department of state's consumer protection division to conduct a study on consumer awareness and financial education in New York state and to make recommendations for a consumer awareness and financial education program.
Title
Directs the New York state department of financial services and the New York state department of state's consumer protection division to conduct a study on consumer awareness and financial education in New York state and to make recommendations for a consumer awareness and financial education program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2020-01-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.177 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1479 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A06070 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - approval memo.33