NY S02375 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of home stability support supplement programs.
Title
Relates to the creation of home stability support supplement programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.482 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A01620 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - amend by restoring to original print 1620