NY S02375 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the creation of home stability support supplement programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the creation of home stability support supplement programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.482
2019-03-05SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES

Same As/Similar To

A01620 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - amend by restoring to original print 1620

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback