NY A01620 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 102-24)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - amend by restoring to original print 1620
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - amend by restoring to original print 1620
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of home stability support supplement programs.
Title
Relates to the creation of home stability support supplement programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Assembly | amend by restoring to original print 1620 |
2020-02-07 | Assembly | print number 1620a |
2020-02-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S02375 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE